## Multiplication Tricks

Two digits multiplication tricks

Supoose the numbers to be multiplied are, 43 * 21 to find the result within a second you can use this trick,

## 1) 4 3 X 2 1

1) While solving two digit multiplication , Place three dashes after equals sign.

`43 * 21 =  ___ ___ ___`

2) Now multiply first digit of first number (here, it is 4) with first digit of second number(here, it is 2) . So result will be 4 * 2 = 8. Place this on first dash. 3) Now multiply second digit of first number (here, it is 3) with last digit of second number(here, it is 1) . So result will be 3 * 1 = 3. Place this on third dash. 4) Now multiply second digit of first number (here, it is 3) with first digit of second number(here, it is 2) . So result will be 3 * 2 = 6. multiply first digit of first number (here, it is 4) with last digit of second number(here, it is 1) . So result will be 4 * 1 = 4 . Add 6 + 4 = 10 . Place 10 on second dash. 0 will be present and one will be carry forward. 5) Output is 903

## 2) 42 X 36 = ____ _____ _____   So, output is 1512.

## Practice yourself with some examples to increase speed,

```1) 43  X  21 = ____ _____ _____
2)  24 X 21 = _____ _____ _____
3)  97 X 49= _____ _____ _____```